Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (32-14) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted (34-13) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Floor Amendment {753825/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Floor Amendment {203128/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {603620/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Third Reading Passed (97-38) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Floor Amendment {793823/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (35-99) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {633420/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/13/2023 | First Reading Judiciary |