House | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646 | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (133-3) | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (38-9) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {223024/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Judiciary | ||
House | 10/11/2022 | Pre-filed |