House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (42-1) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Third Reading Passed (107-25) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/13/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters |