House | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (105-32) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/16/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters |