House | 04/11/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/16/2023 | First Reading Appropriations |