Senate | 04/07/2023 | Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {593822/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate Korman) Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {593822/1 | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/16/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |