House | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {683021/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means |