House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {493823/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |