House
|
04/24/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (136-3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Floor Amendment {563823/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#235-267) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#234) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#84) Adopted (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#79) Adopted (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#78) Adopted (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#233) Adopted (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#27) Adopted (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#18) Adopted (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
with the exception of amendments 18, 27, 77, 78, 79, 84, and 233 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#17-233)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#7-16) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#2-6) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Referred Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (130-3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Floor Amendment {763128/1 (Delegate Chang) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#126) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#110-125) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#109) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#13-108) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#10-12) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee Amendment (#2-9) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Delegate Chang) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
First Reading Appropriations
|
|
|