House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {243024/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 11/17/2022 | Pre-filed |