House
|
05/03/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (35-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (135-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Conference Committee Report {643424/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lam, Ellis and Ready)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Senate Refuses Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bagnall, Rosenberg and Kipke)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
House Requests Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {713726/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred Finance
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {783621/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2023
|
Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
First Reading Health and Government Operations
|
|
|