House | 05/28/2023 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 798 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (125-15) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {883627/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Third Reading Passed (128-8) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {413329/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |