Senate | 03/10/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading Passed (126-12) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {233123/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |