House | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {743520/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |