1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. |
---|
4 | 4 | | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. |
---|
5 | 5 | | *hb0257* |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | HOUSE BILL 257 |
---|
8 | 8 | | C7 3lr2314 |
---|
9 | 9 | | HB 1316/22 – W&M CF 3lr2089 |
---|
10 | 10 | | By: Delegate Ebersole |
---|
11 | 11 | | Introduced and read first time: January 25, 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | Assigned to: Ways and Means |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A BILL ENTITLED |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | AN ACT concerning 1 |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines 2 |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | FOR the purpose of allowing an entity licensed to offer instant bingo under a commercial 3 |
---|
21 | 21 | | bingo license on a certain date to operate up to a certain number of electronic instant 4 |
---|
22 | 22 | | bingo machines; and generally relating to electronic instant bingo machines. 5 |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6 |
---|
25 | 25 | | Article – Criminal Law 7 |
---|
26 | 26 | | Section 12–308 8 |
---|
27 | 27 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 9 |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2021 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 10 |
---|
29 | 29 | | |
---|
30 | 30 | | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 11 |
---|
31 | 31 | | Chapter 603 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2012 12 |
---|
32 | 32 | | Section 3 13 |
---|
33 | 33 | | |
---|
34 | 34 | | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14 |
---|
35 | 35 | | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15 |
---|
36 | 36 | | |
---|
37 | 37 | | Article – Criminal Law 16 |
---|
38 | 38 | | |
---|
39 | 39 | | 12–308. 17 |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | Notwithstanding any other provisions of this subtitle, an entity licensed to offer 18 |
---|
42 | 42 | | instant bingo under a commercial bingo license on July 1, 2007, or by a qualified 19 |
---|
43 | 43 | | organization as defined in § 13–201 of this article on the premises of the qualified 20 |
---|
44 | 44 | | organization may continue to operate a game of instant bingo in the same manner using 21 |
---|
45 | 45 | | electronic machines, provided that: 22 |
---|
46 | 46 | | 2 HOUSE BILL 257 |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | |
---|
49 | 49 | | [(1) (i) the machines were in operation for a 1–year period ending 1 |
---|
50 | 50 | | December 31, 2007; or 2 |
---|
51 | 51 | | |
---|
52 | 52 | | (ii) the machines were in operation under a commercial bingo license 3 |
---|
53 | 53 | | on December 31, 2007;] 4 |
---|
54 | 54 | | |
---|
55 | 55 | | [(2)] (1) (I) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED I N ITEM (II) OF THIS ITEM, the entity 5 |
---|
56 | 56 | | does not operate more than the number of electronic machines in operation on February 6 |
---|
57 | 57 | | 28, 2008; OR 7 |
---|
58 | 58 | | |
---|
59 | 59 | | (II) 1. IF THE ENTITY OPERATED 85 ELECTRONIC MACHINES 8 |
---|
60 | 60 | | ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 100 ELECTRONIC 9 |
---|
61 | 61 | | MACHINES; 10 |
---|
62 | 62 | | |
---|
63 | 63 | | 2. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 87 ELECTRONIC MACHINES 11 |
---|
64 | 64 | | ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 100 ELECTRONIC 12 |
---|
65 | 65 | | MACHINES; 13 |
---|
66 | 66 | | |
---|
67 | 67 | | 3. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 100 ELECTRONIC 14 |
---|
68 | 68 | | MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 150 15 |
---|
69 | 69 | | ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; 16 |
---|
70 | 70 | | |
---|
71 | 71 | | 4. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 103 ELECTRONIC 17 |
---|
72 | 72 | | MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 150 18 |
---|
73 | 73 | | ELECTRONIC MACHIN ES; 19 |
---|
74 | 74 | | |
---|
75 | 75 | | 5. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 200 ELECTRONIC 20 |
---|
76 | 76 | | MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 250 21 |
---|
77 | 77 | | ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; AND 22 |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | 6. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 278 ELECTRONIC 23 |
---|
80 | 80 | | MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 295 24 |
---|
81 | 81 | | ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; and 25 |
---|
82 | 82 | | |
---|
83 | 83 | | [(3)] (2) the conduct of the gaming and operation of the machines are 26 |
---|
84 | 84 | | consistent with all other provisions of this article. 27 |
---|
85 | 85 | | |
---|
86 | 86 | | Chapter 603 of the Acts of 2012 28 |
---|
87 | 87 | | |
---|
88 | 88 | | SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, a licensee or organizatio n 29 |
---|
89 | 89 | | that is authorized under State law to own or operate electronic bingo machines for use after 30 |
---|
90 | 90 | | July 1, 2012, may repair and replace the authorized electronic bingo machines provided 31 |
---|
91 | 91 | | that the machines operate in the same manner as those in operation by the same 32 |
---|
92 | 92 | | organization as of February 28, 2008[, and that the organization does not operate more 33 |
---|
93 | 93 | | than the number of electronic bingo machines in operation as of February 28, 2008]. 34 HOUSE BILL 257 3 |
---|
94 | 94 | | |
---|
95 | 95 | | |
---|
96 | 96 | | |
---|
97 | 97 | | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 1 |
---|
98 | 98 | | 1, 2023. 2 |
---|
99 | 99 | | |
---|