House | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Third Reading Passed (106-34) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (39-8) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {563428/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (103-31) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {903825/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |