House | 04/10/2023 | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Amprey, Rogers and Rose) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Klausmeier, Beidle and Mautz) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Senate Refuses Recede | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | House Requests Senate Recede | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {273127/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (102-33) | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters |