House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253 | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (97-39) | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (31-13) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {883529/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Third Reading Passed (93-37) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Floor Amendment {613726/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (36-91) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Floor Amendment {543322/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (37-90) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Motion Laid Over (Delegate Fisher) Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Floor Amendment {543322/1 (Delegate Fisher) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {803622/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/29/2023 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |