WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 253 – 1 – Chapter 253 (House Bill 283) AN ACT concerning Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Gender–Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act) FOR the purpose of requiring, beginning on a certain date, the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide medically necessary gender–affirming treatment in a nondiscriminatory manner; requiring that the gender–affirming treatment be assessed according to nondiscriminatory criteria that are consistent with current clinical standards; prohibiting the Program from issuing an adverse benefit determination related to gender–affirming treatment unless a health care provider with experience prescribing or delivering gender–affirming treatment has reviewed and confirmed the appropriateness of the determination; and generally relating to gender–affirming treatment and the Maryland Medical Assistance Program. BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, Article – Health – General Section 15–103(a)(1) Annotated Code of Maryland (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, Article – Health – General Section 15–103(a)(2)(xx) and (xxi) Annotated Code of Maryland (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) BY adding to Article – Health – General Section 15–103(a)(2)(xxii) and 15–151 Annotated Code of Maryland (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBL Y OF MARYLAND, That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: Article – Health – General 15–103. (a) (1) The Secretary shall administer the Maryland Medical Assistance Program. Ch. 253 2023 LAWS OF MARYLAND – 2 – (2) The Program: (xx) Beginning on July 1, 2023, shall provide, subject to federal approval and limitations of the State budget, community violence prevention services in accordance with 15–141.3 of this subtitle; [and] (xxi) Beginning on January 1, 2023, shall provide, subject to the limitations of the State budget, and as permitted by federal law, coverage for self–measured blood pressure monitoring for all Program recipients diagnosed with uncontrolled high blood pressure, including: 1. The provision of validated home blood pressure monitors; and 2. Reimbursement of health care provider and other staff time used for patient training, transmission of blood pressure data, interpretation of blood pressure readings and reporting, and the delivery of co –interventions, including educational materials or classes, behavioral change management, and medication management; AND (XXII) BEGINNING ON JANUARY 1, 2024, SHALL PROVIDE GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 15–151 OF THIS SUBTITLE. 15–151. (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE FOL LOWING WORDS HAVE TH E MEANINGS INDICATED. (2) (I) “GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT ” MEANS ANY MEDICALLY NECESSARY TREATMENT CONSISTENT WITH CURRENT CLINICA L STANDARDS OF CARE PR ESCRIBED BY A LICENS ED HEALTH CARE PROVI DER FOR THE TREATMENT OF A CONDITION RELAT ED TO THE INDIVIDUAL ’S GENDER IDENTITY. (II) “GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT ” INCLUDES: 1. HORMONE THERAPY , HORMONE BLOCKERS , AND PUBERTY BLOCKERS ; 2. HAIR ALTERATION FOR T HE PURPOSES OF ALTER ING SECONDARY SEX CHARAC TERISTICS AND SURGICAL SITE PREPARATION ; WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 253 – 3 – 3. ALTERATIONS TO VOICE , VOICE THERAPY , AND VOICE LESSONS; 4. ALTERATIONS TO ABDOME N, CHEST, TRUNK, AND BUTTOCKS; 5. ALTERATIONS TO THE FACE AND NECK ; 6. ALTERATIONS TO THE GENITALS AND GONADS; 7. LASER TREATMENT FOR S CARS FROM GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT ; 8. STANDARD FERTILITY PR ESERVATION PROCEDURE S, AS SET FORTH IN § 15–810.1 OF THE INSURANCE ARTICLE; 9. REVISIONS TO PREVIOUS TREATMENTS AND REVERSAL OF TREATMEN TS; 10. COMBINATIONS OF GENDER –AFFIRMING PROCEDURES ; AND 11. OTHER TREATMENTS AS P RESCRIBED TO SUPPRES S THE DEVELOPMENT OF E NDOGENOUS SECONDARY SEX CHARACTERISTICS , ALIGN THE INDIVIDUAL ’S APPEARANCE OR PHYS ICAL BODY WITH GENDE R IDENTITY, AND ALLEVIATE SYMPTOMS O F CLINICALLY SIGNIFICANT DISTR ESS RESULTING FROM GENDER DYSPHORIA . (III) “GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT ” MAY INCLUDE TREATMENT DESCRIBED IN THE CURRENT CLINI CAL STANDARDS OF CAR E FOR GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT PUBLISHED BY THE WORLD PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH. (3) “GENDER IDENTITY ” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN § 20–101 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE. (B) IT IS THE INTENT OF T HE GENERAL ASSEMBLY THAT THE PROGRAM PROVIDE GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT TO ALL PROGRAM RECIPIENTS FO R WHOM GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT IS M EDICALLY NECESSARY , INCLUDING TRANSGENDER , NONBINARY, INTERSEX, TWO–SPIRIT, AND OTHER GENDER DIV ERSE INDIVIDUALS. (C) (1) THE PROGRAM SHALL PROVIDE COVERAGE FOR MEDICAL LY NECESSARY GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT IN A NONDISCRIMINATO RY MANNER. Ch. 253 2023 LAWS OF MARYLAND – 4 – (2) THE GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT SHALL BE ASSESSED ACCORDING TO NONDISC RIMINATORY CRITERIA THAT ARE CONSISTENT WITH CURRENT CLINICAL STA NDARDS OF CARE . (3) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT DENY OR LIMIT COVERAGE FO R GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT WHEN THAT TR EATMENT IS: (I) PRESCRIBED TO A PROGRAM RECIPIENT BEC AUSE OF, RELATED TO, OR CONSISTENT WITH T HE RECIPIENT’S GENDER IDENTITY ; (II) MEDICALLY NECESSARY ; AND (III) PRESCRIBED IN ACCORDA NCE WITH CURRENT CLI NICAL STANDARDS OF CARE . (4) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT DENY OR LIMIT COVERAGE FO R GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT BASED ON THE PROGRAM RECIPIENT ’S GENDER IDENTITY. (5) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT EXCLU DE GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT , INCLUDING REVISIONS TO PRIOR GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT , ON THE BASIS TH AT THE TREATMENT IS A COSMETIC SERVICE . (6) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT ESTAB LISH A CATEGORICAL E XCLUSION FOR A PARTICULAR GEN DER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT . (7) THE PROGRAM MAY NOT ISSUE AN ADVERSE BENEFIT DETERMINATION DENYIN G OR LIMITING ACCESS TO GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT UNLESS A H EALTH CARE PROVIDER WITH EXPERIENCE PRES CRIBING OR DELIVERING GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT HAS REVIEWED AND CON FIRMED THE APPROPRIATENESS OF THE ADVERSE BENEF IT DETERMINATION . (D) (1) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1 EACH YEAR, BEGINNING IN 2024, EACH MANAGED CARE OR GANIZATION SHALL SUB MIT TO THE DEPARTMENT A REPORT THAT INCLUDES , FOR EACH HEALTH CARE PROVIDER OFFERING GENDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT WITH WHICH THE MANAG ED CARE ORGANIZATION HAS AN ACTIVE CONTRA CT AND WHO THAT CONSENTS TO THE INCLUSION : (I) THE NAME AND LOCATION OF EACH THE HEALTH CARE PROVIDER OFFERING GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT WITH WHICH THE MANAG ED CARE ORGANIZATION HA S AN ACTIVE CONTRACT ; AND WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 253 – 5 – (II) THE TYPES OF GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT PROVIDED BY EACH THE HEALTH CARE PROVIDER ; AND (III) WHETHER THE HEALTH CA RE PROVIDER CONSENTS TO BEING PUBLICLY LISTE D AS PART OF THE DEPARTMENT ’S ANNUAL REPORT REQUIRED UNDER PARAG RAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION . (2) (I) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1 EACH YEAR, BEGINNING IN 2025, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL COMP ILE AN ANNUAL REPORT ON GEOGRAPHIC ACCESS TO GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT ACROSS THE STATE. (II) THE REPORT SHALL INCL UDE, FOR EACH HEALTH CARE PROVIDER OFFERING GE NDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT TO PROGRAM RECIPIENTS AND WHOSE C ONSENT TO THE INCLUS ION IS INDICATED IN A REPORT SUBMITTED UNDER PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION : 1. THE NAME AND LOCATION OF EACH THE HEALTH CARE PROVIDER OFFERING GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT TO PROGRAM RECIPIENTS; 2. THE MANAGED CARE ORGA NIZATIONS THAT HAVE ACTIVE CONTRACTS WIT H EACH THE HEALTH CARE PROVIDER ; AND 3. THE TYPES OF GENDER –AFFIRMING TREATMENT PROVIDED BY EACH THE HEALTH CARE PROVIDER . (III) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL PUBL ISH THE REPORT IN A CONSPICUOU S MANNER ON THE DEPARTMENT ’S WEBSITE. (3) THE DEPARTMENT AND EACH M ANAGED CARE ORGANIZA TION SHALL INCLUDE THE NA ME, LOCATION, AND TYPES OF SERVICE S FOR EACH PROVIDER OFFERING GE NDER–AFFIRMING TREATMENT IN THEIR PROVIDER DIRECTORIES. SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect October 1, 2023. Approved by the Governor, May 3, 2023.