Senate | 04/07/2023 | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (99-33) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {713629/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |