Senate | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading Passed (97-37) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Judiciary |