House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-1) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Third Reading Passed (118-21) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {413323/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) | ||
House | 01/29/2023 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters |