House | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {103028/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Smith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {103028/1 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Judiciary |