House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (117-22) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {353820/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading Passed (112-24) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {283422/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |