Senate | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {153621/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |