Senate | 03/16/2023 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {453927/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means |