House | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 787 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {343626/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means |