Senate | 03/23/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (105-30) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {113723/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | First Reading Appropriations |