House | 04/11/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 28 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters |