House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {453524/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |