House | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Adopted | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | First Reading Appropriations |