House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {233624/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means |