House | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 719 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Third Reading Passed (108-24) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {593224/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Judiciary | ||
House | 10/19/2022 | Pre-filed |