House | 04/11/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {743026/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |