House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (126-6) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/22/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 11/18/2022 | Pre-filed |