Maryland 2023 2023 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB48 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/17/2023

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0048*  
  
HOUSE BILL 48 
J1   	3lr0899 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 101 
By: Delegate Bagnall 
Requested: November 18, 2022 
Introduced and read first time: January 11, 2023 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
Committee Report: Favorable 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 9, 2023 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Collaborative Care Model Services – 2 
Implementation and Reimbursement Expansion 3 
 
FOR the purpose of repealing the Collaborative Care Pilot Program; requiring the 4 
Maryland Department of Health to implement and provide reimbursement for 5 
services provided in accordance with the Collaborative Care Model under the 6 
Maryland Medical Assistance Program; and generally relating to the provision and 7 
reimbursement of somatic and behavioral health services in primary care settings 8 
under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program. 9 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 10 
 Article – Health – General 11 
Section 15–141.1 12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 14 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 15 
 Chapter 683 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2018 16 
Section 2 17 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 18 
 Chapter 684 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2018 19 
 Section 2 20 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 48  
 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 
 
Article – Health – General 3 
 
15–141.1. 4 
 
 (a) [(1)] In this section [the following words have the meanings indicated. 5 
 
 (2)], “Collaborative Care Model” means an evidence–based approach for 6 
integrating somatic and behavioral health services in primary care settings that includes: 7 
 
 [(i)] (1) Care coordination and management; 8 
 
 [(ii)] (2) Regular, proactive outcome monitoring and treatment for 9 
outcome targets using standardized outcome measurement rating scales and electronic 10 
tools, such as patient tracking; and 11 
 
 [(iii)] (3) Regular systematic psychiatric and substance use disorder 12 
caseload reviews and consultation with a psychiatrist, an addiction medicine specialist, or 13 
any other behavioral health medicine specialist as allowed under federal regulations 14 
governing the model. 15 
 
 [(3) “Pilot Program” means the Collaborative Care Pilot Program.] 16 
 
 (b) This section may not be construed to prohibit referrals from a primary care 17 
provider to a specialty behavioral health care provider. 18 
 
 [(c) There is a Collaborative Care Pilot Program in the Department. 19 
 
 (d) The purpose of the Pilot Program is to establish and implement a 20 
Collaborative Care Model in primary care settings in which health care services are 21 
provided to Program recipients enrolled in HealthChoice. 22 
 
 (e) The Department shall administer the Pilot Program. 23 
 
 (f) (1) The Department shall select up to three sites at which a Collaborative 24 
Care Model shall be established over a 4–year period. 25 
 
 (2) The sites selected by the Department shall be adult or pediatric 26 
nonspecialty medical practices or health systems that serve a significant number of 27 
Program recipients. 28 
 
 (3) To the extent practicable, one of the sites selected by the Department 29 
under paragraph (1) of this subsection shall be located in a rural area of the State. 30 
   	HOUSE BILL 48 	3 
 
 
 (g) The sites selected by the Department under subsection (f) of this section shall 1 
ensure that treatment services, prescriptions, and care management that would be 2 
provided to an individual under the Pilot Program are not duplicative of specialty 3 
behavioral health care services being received by the individual. 4 
 
 (h) The Department shall provide funding to sites participating in the Pilot 5 
Program for: 6 
 
 (1) Infrastructure development, including the development of a patient 7 
registry and other monitoring, reporting, and billing tools required to implement a 8 
Collaborative Care Model; 9 
 
 (2) Training staff to implement the Collaborative Care Model; 10 
 
 (3) Staffing for care management and psychiatric consultation provided 11 
under the Collaborative Care Model; and 12 
 
 (4) Other purposes necessary to implement and evaluate the Collaborative 13 
Care Model. 14 
 
 (i) The Department shall: 15 
 
 (1) Collaborate with stakeholders in the development, implementation, 16 
and outcome monitoring of the Pilot Program; and 17 
 
 (2) Collect outcomes data on recipients of health care services under the 18 
Pilot Program to: 19 
 
 (i) Evaluate the effectiveness of the Collaborative Care Model, 20 
including by evaluating the number of and outcomes for individuals who: 21 
 
 1. Were not diagnosed as having a behavioral health 22 
condition before receiving treatment through the Pilot Program; 23 
 
 2. Were not diagnosed as having a behavioral health 24 
condition before being referred to and treated by a specialty behavioral health provider; 25 
 
 3. Received behavioral health services in a primary care 26 
setting before receiving treatment through the Pilot Program; and 27 
 
 4. Received specialty behavioral health care services before 28 
being identified as eligible to receive treatment through the Pilot Program; and 29 
 
 (ii) Determine whether to]  30 
  4 	HOUSE BILL 48  
 
 
 (C) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL implement AND PROVIDE REIMBURS EMENT 1 
FOR SERVICES PROVIDE D IN ACCORDANCE WITH the Collaborative Care Model 2 
statewide in primary care settings that provide health care services to Program recipients. 3 
 
 [(j) The Department shall apply to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid 4 
Services for an amendment to the State’s § 1115 HealthChoice Demonstration waiver if 5 
necessary to implement the Pilot Program. 6 
 
 (k) For fiscal year 2020, fiscal year 2021, fiscal year 2022, and fiscal year 2023, 7 
the Governor shall include in the annual budget an appropriation of $550,000 for the Pilot 8 
Program. 9 
 
 (l) On or before November 1, 2023, the Department shall report to the Governor 10 
and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly 11 
on the Department’s findings and recommendations from the Pilot Program.] 12 
 
Chapter 683 of the Acts of 2018 13 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 14 
1, 2018. [It shall remain effective for a period of 6 years and, at the end of June 30, 2024, 15 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 16 
of no further force and effect.] 17 
 
Chapter 684 of the Acts of 2018 18 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 19 
1, 2018. [It shall remain effective for a period of 6 years and, at the end of June 30, 2024, 20 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 21 
of no further force and effect.] 22 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 23 
October 1, 2023. 24 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.