House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (37-10) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Third Reading Passed (115-20) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {413025/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |