Senate | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {943127/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters | ||
House | 11/20/2022 | Pre-filed |