House | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {433229/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means |