Maryland 2023 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB530 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
55 *hb0530*
66
77 HOUSE BILL 530
88 M1 3lr1267
99
1010 By: Delegate Kerr
1111 Introduced and read first time: February 1, 2023
1212 Assigned to: Environment and Transportation
1313
1414 A BILL ENTITLED
1515
1616 AN ACT concerning 1
1717
1818 Natural Resources – Forest Mitigation Banks and the Forest Conservation Fund 2
1919 – Alterations 3
2020
2121 FOR the purpose of altering the definition of “qualified conservation” for purposes of 4
2222 provisions of law related to forest mitigation banks; extending the deadline for the 5
2323 Department of Natural Resources to accomplish the reforestation or afforestation for 6
2424 which certain money is deposited to the Forest Conservation Fund; altering the 7
2525 development projects for which afforestation or reforestation credits granted may not 8
2626 exceed a certain percentage of forest conserved; establishing that money in the Fund 9
2727 that is encumbered within a certain time period may not revert to certain persons 10
2828 for certain use; and generally relating to forest conservation. 11
2929
3030 BY renumbering 12
3131 Article – Natural Resources 13
3232 Section 5–1601(hh) through (qq) 14
3333 to be Section 5–1601(ii) through (rr), respectively 15
3434 Annotated Code of Maryland 16
3535 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 17
3636
3737 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 18
3838 Article – Natural Resources 19
3939 Section 5–1601(a) and 5–1610(b) 20
4040 Annotated Code of Maryland 21
4141 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 22
4242
4343 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 23
4444 Article – Natural Resources 24
4545 Section 5–1601(gg), 5–1607(b), and 5–1610(e) 25
4646 Annotated Code of Maryland 26
4747 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 27
4848 2 HOUSE BILL 530
4949
5050
5151 BY adding to 1
5252 Article – Natural Resources 2
5353 Section 5–1601(hh) 3
5454 Annotated Code of Maryland 4
5555 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 5
5656
5757 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6
5858 Chapter 645 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2021 7
5959 Section 11 8
6060
6161 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 9
6262 That Section(s) 5–1601(hh) through (qq) of Article – Natural Resources of the Annotated 10
6363 Code of Maryland be renumbered to be Section(s) 5–1601(ii) through (rr), respectively. 11
6464
6565 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the Laws of Maryland read 12
6666 as follows: 13
6767
6868 Article – Natural Resources 14
6969
7070 5–1601. 15
7171
7272 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 16
7373
7474 (gg) “Qualified conservation” means the conservation of all or a part of an existing 17
7575 forest that: 18
7676
7777 (1) [Was] HAS BEEN approved [on or before December 31, 2020,] by the 19
7878 appropriate State or local forest conservation program for the purpose of establishing a 20
7979 forest mitigation bank; and 21
8080
8181 (2) Is encumbered in perpetuity by a restrictive easement, covenant, or 22
8282 another similar mechanism recorded in the county land records to conserve its character 23
8383 as a forest. 24
8484
8585 (HH) “QUALIFIED PROJECT ” MEANS A PROJECT THAT USES QUALIFIED 25
8686 CONSERVATION FOR WHI CH AN APPLICATION WA S SUBMITTED OR APPRO VED ON OR 26
8787 BEFORE DECEMBER 31, 2020. 27
8888
8989 5–1607. 28
9090
9191 (b) Standards for meeting afforestation or reforestation requirements shall be 29
9292 established by the State or local program using one or more of the following methods: 30
9393
9494 (1) Forest creation in accordance with a forest conservation plan using one 31
9595 or more of the following: 32
9696
9797 (i) Transplanted or nursery stock; 33 HOUSE BILL 530 3
9898
9999
100100
101101 (ii) Whip and seedling stock; or 1
102102
103103 (iii) Natural regeneration where it can be shown to adequately meet 2
104104 the objective of the forest conservation plan. 3
105105
106106 (2) [The] FOR A QUALIFIED PROJE CT, THE use of qualified conservation 4
107107 completed in a forest mitigation bank, in which case, the afforestation or reforestation 5
108108 credit granted may not exceed 50% of the forest area encumbered in perpetuity. 6
109109
110110 (3) The use of street trees in a municipal corporation with a tree 7
111111 management plan, in an existing population center designated in a county master plan that 8
112112 has been adopted to conform with the Economic Growth, Resource Protection, and Planning 9
113113 Act of 1992, or in any other designated area approved by the Department as part of a local 10
114114 program, under criteria established by the local program, subject to the approval of the 11
115115 Department, using: 12
116116
117117 (i) Street trees as a permissible step in the priority sequence for 13
118118 afforestation or reforestation and, based on a mature canopy coverage, may grant full credit 14
119119 as a mitigation technique; and 15
120120
121121 (ii) Acquisition as a mitigation technique of an off–site protective 16
122122 easement for existing forested areas not currently protected in perpetuity, in which case 17
123123 the afforestation or reforestation credit granted may not exceed 50% of the area of forest 18
124124 cover protected. 19
125125
126126 (4) When all other options, both on–site and off–site, have been exhausted, 20
127127 landscaping as a mitigation technique, conducted under an approved landscaping plan that 21
128128 establishes a forest at least 35 feet wide and covering at least 2,500 square feet of area. 22
129129
130130 5–1610. 23
131131
132132 (b) There is a Forest Conservation Fund in the Department. 24
133133
134134 (e) (1) The Department shall accomplish the reforestation or afforestation for 25
135135 which the money is deposited within [2] 5 years or [3] 6 growing seasons, as appropriate, 26
136136 after receipt of the money. 27
137137
138138 (2) Money deposited in the Fund under subsection (c) of this section shall 28
139139 remain in the Fund for a period of [2] 5 years or [3] 6 growing seasons, and at the end of 29
140140 that time period, any portion that has not been used OR ENCUMBERED to meet the 30
141141 afforestation or reforestation requirements shall be returned to the person who provided 31
142142 the money to be used for documented tree planting in the same county or watershed beyond 32
143143 that required by this subtitle or other applicable statutes. 33
144144
145145 Chapter 645 of the Acts of 2021 34
146146 4 HOUSE BILL 530
147147
148148
149149 SECTION 11. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, except as provided in 1
150150 Section 10 of this Act, this Act shall take effect June 1, 2021. Sections 1[, 2,] and 7 of this 2
151151 Act shall remain effective for a period of 3 years and 1 month and, at the end of June 30, 3
152152 2024, Sections 1[, 2,] and 7 of this Act, with no further action required by the General 4
153153 Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. Subject to Section 10 of this 5
154154 Act, Sections 3, 4, and 5 of this Act shall remain effective for a period of 10 years and 1 6
155155 month and, at the end of June 30, 2031, Sections 3, 4, and 5 of this Act, with no further 7
156156 action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and 8
157157 effect. Section 6 of this Act shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and 1 month and, 9
158158 at the end of June 30, 2023, Section 6 of this Act, with no further action required by the 10
159159 General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 11
160160
161161 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act s hall take effect July 12
162162 1, 2023. 13
163163