House
|
04/24/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (100-38)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Floor Amendment {403529/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (13-34)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Floor Amendment {353323/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (12-35)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {853821/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Floor Amendment {733428/1 (Delegate Tomlinson) Rejected (39-98)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Floor Amendment {163525/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (39-97)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Motion Laid Over (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Floor Amendment {163525/1 (Delegate Kipke)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Floor Amendment {843625/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (37-100)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {343422/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
First Reading Ways and Means
|
|
|