House | 05/12/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Floor Amendment {293924/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (35-95) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {503028/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means |