House | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |