Senate | 03/16/2023 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |