Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Third Reading Passed (100-38) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {513925/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |