House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/19/2023 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-1) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |