House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation Finance | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Third Reading Passed (122-15) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {343025/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means |