House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447 | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (102-36) | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (36-11) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {133627/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Third Reading Passed (98-36) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {783528/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means |