Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {883920/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (129-7) | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {573321/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |