House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |